NY S07239 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes financial disincentives for voluntary public library system and reference and research library resources system mergers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes financial disincentives for voluntary public library system and reference and research library resources system mergers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblyVETOED MEMO.171
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.366
2012-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10347
2012-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-13SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1250
2012-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-05SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2012-05-02SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10347 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s7239

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback