NY S07235 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the supervision of the manufacturing and repacking of certain medical gases or wholesaling of respiratory therapy agents.
Title
Relates to the supervision of the manufacturing and repacking of certain medical gases or wholesaling of respiratory therapy agents.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.815 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07279 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education