NY S07235 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the central pine barrens area and the core preservation area; adds metes and bounds descriptions for property additions to the central pine barrens area and core preservation area.
Title
Relates to the central pine barrens area and the core preservation area; adds metes and bounds descriptions for property additions to the central pine barrens area and core preservation area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.74 |
2018-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08885 (Same As) 2018-01-18 - advanced to third reading cal.612