NY S07228 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.
Title
Relates to a judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders; expands definition for an eligible defendant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-07 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.435 |
2021-10-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.150 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a5511a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1721 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A05511 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7228