NY S07221 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for Genesis Villella to qualify for and receive certain spousal accidental death benefits; splits such benefit equally between Genesis Villella and dependents Deliliah Vega and Peter Vega for the rest of such dependents' lifetimes, once the youngest dependent reaches the age of twenty-five.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows for Genesis Villella to qualify for and receive certain spousal accidental death benefits; splits such benefit equally between Genesis Villella and dependents Deliliah Vega and Peter Vega for the rest of such dependents' lifetimes, once the youngest dependent reaches the age of twenty-five.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-06-10SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2023-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1592
2023-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-18SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07397 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental employees

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback