NY S07219 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.338
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.338
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the court clerk and deputy clerk/treasurer of the village of Mount Morris, in the county of Livingston, need not be a resident of such town, so long as he or she is a resident of Livingston county or an adjoining county within the state.
Title
Provides that the court clerk and deputy clerk/treasurer of the village of Mount Morris, in the county of Livingston, need not be a resident of such town, so long as he or she is a resident of Livingston county or an adjoining county within the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.338 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1012 |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a9062a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7219A |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.285 |
2018-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09062 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7219a