NY S07215 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - approval memo.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - approval memo.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires new homeless shelters to conduct a public hearing in the community where the proposed shelter is to be located before being sited.
Title
Requires new homeless shelters to conduct a public hearing in the community where the proposed shelter is to be located before being sited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | Senate | approval memo.72 |
2020-12-31 | Senate | signed chap.383 |
2020-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1011 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7215A |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.173 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.173 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-10 | Senate | print number 7820a |
2020-07-10 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to cities |
2019-05-23 | Senate | referred to cities |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7820A |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1011 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7215A |
2020-07-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07820 (Same As) 2020-12-31 - approval memo.72