NY S07211 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates certain offenses and provisions related to the unlawful dissemination of a personal image; creates a private right of action for such offenses.
Title
Creates certain offenses and provisions related to the unlawful dissemination of a personal image; creates a private right of action for such offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.88 |
2022-12-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.805 |
2022-12-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.62 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a1121c |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1509 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7211B |
2022-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7211A |
2022-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01121 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s7211b