NY S07200 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the admission of a defendant's previous declarations or statements when the crime committed is a hate crime.
Title
Allows for the admission of a defendant's previous declarations or statements when the crime committed is a hate crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.287 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09539 (Same As) 2020-01-24 - referred to codes