NY S07198 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 7198C
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 7198C
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an educational program related to the prevention of anti-Semitism, Islamophobia bias and discrimination based on religion, race, sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Title
Establishes an educational program related to the prevention of anti-Semitism, Islamophobia bias and discrimination based on religion, race, sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7198C |
2020-06-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-02-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7198B |
2020-02-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7198A |
2020-01-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09599 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - print number 9599b