NY S07197 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - SIGNED CHAP.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to tickets to places of entertainment.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to tickets to places of entertainment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.148 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.252 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a3861a |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1683 |
2021-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03861 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7197