NY S07196 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.566
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.566
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to taxpayers filing under article twenty-two of the tax law to include for the purposes of the tax factor all business income attributable to a QEZE business.
Title
Relates to taxpayers filing under article twenty-two of the tax law to include for the purposes of the tax factor all business income attributable to a QEZE business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.566 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.471 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9220c |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1492 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7196B |
2014-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7196A |
2014-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09220 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7196b