NY S07195 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to services and expenses relating to investigations and hearings related to proceedings pursuant to article six of section twenty-four of the New York state constitution, and articles seven-c and thirteen-a of the judiciary law.
Title
Relates to services and expenses relating to investigations and hearings related to proceedings pursuant to article six of section twenty-four of the New York state constitution, and articles seven-c and thirteen-a of the judiciary law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1615 |
2021-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08024 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means