NY S07194 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - ordered to third reading cal.434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - ordered to third reading cal.434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides access to students on information pertaining to voter education.
Title
Provides access to students on information pertaining to voter education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.434 |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | substituted for a8998 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2020-01-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.118 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08998 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - ordered to third reading cal.434