NY S07189 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions of the property/casualty insurance availability act and the authority of the New York property insurance underwriting association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions of the property/casualty insurance availability act and the authority of the New York property insurance underwriting association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30SenateSIGNED CHAP.182
2023-06-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-05-31Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-05-31Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-31Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.409
2023-05-31Assemblysubstituted for a7352
2023-05-30Assemblyreferred to insurance
2023-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1193
2023-05-18SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A07352 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - substituted by s7189

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback