NY S07189 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to contracts for transportation of children in the county and city of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to contracts for transportation of children in the county and city of New York.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.424
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.459
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10184
2012-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1416
2012-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-05-01SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A10184 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7189

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback