NY S07188 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - SIGNED CHAP.347
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - SIGNED CHAP.347
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to grand jury proceedings.
Title
Relates to grand jury proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.347 |
2014-08-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.172 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a8780 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.767 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08780 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s7188