NY S07186 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that authorities having control of a fire department or fire company which provides emergency medical services may establish fees and charges for services.
Title
Provides that authorities having control of a fire department or fire company which provides emergency medical services may establish fees and charges for services.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] |
Sen. Edward Rath III [R] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.225 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7186A |
2022-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1609 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00534 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - print number 534b