NY S07185 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office for the prevention of domestic violence to conduct a study on domestic violence in the transgender community with a focus on Black transgender women.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the office for the prevention of domestic violence to conduct a study on domestic violence in the transgender community with a focus on Black transgender women.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.518
2024-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a10397
2024-05-20Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2024-05-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-04-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-04-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-04-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.830
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
2023-05-18SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES

Same As/Similar To

A10397 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s7185

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback