NY S07181 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.79
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.79
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to civil immunity for information shared with the National Insurance Crime Bureau.
Title
Relates to civil immunity for information shared with the National Insurance Crime Bureau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.79 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.396 |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | substituted for a8945 |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2020-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.105 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08945 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.79