NY S07180 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - SIGNED CHAP.295
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - SIGNED CHAP.295
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes farm vehicles to travel on a highway from the point of sale to a farm.
Title
Authorizes farm vehicles to travel on a highway from the point of sale to a farm.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.295 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.445 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a8664a |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7180A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-07 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1111 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08664 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7180a