NY S07177 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the marine mammal and sea turtle protection area.
Title
Establishes the marine mammal and sea turtle protection area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.77 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.366 |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | substituted for a8962 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.101 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08962 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.77