NY S07176 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the "advanced building codes, appliance and equipment efficiency standards act of 2021"; adds the promotion of clean energy and the implementation of the climate agenda set forth in the New York state climate leadership and community protection act to the state energy conservation construction code; increases the efficiency standards of appliances and equipment by the state energy conservation construction code; increases the energy efficiency standards of appliances and equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "advanced building codes, appliance and equipment efficiency standards act of 2021"; adds the promotion of clean energy and the implementation of the climate agenda set forth in the New York state climate leadership and community protection act to the state energy conservation construction code; increases the efficiency standards of appliances and equipment by the state energy conservation construction code; increases the energy efficiency standards of appliances and equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-06-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1605
2021-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08143 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - referred to energy

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback