NY S07168 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to reporting Lyme and tick-borne disease infection after death to the department of health according to the manner prescribed by the commissioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to reporting Lyme and tick-borne disease infection after death to the department of health according to the manner prescribed by the commissioner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16Assemblyreferred to health
2018-05-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1151
2018-05-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A09535 (Same As) 2018-01-19 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback