NY S07164 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes nursing home medication aides to administer medication in residential health care facilities in St. Lawrence county.
Title
Authorizes nursing home medication aides to administer medication in residential health care facilities in St. Lawrence county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7164A |
2018-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.378 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07377 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - print number 7377a