NY S07162 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7914C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7914C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing service credit for unpaid or reduced paid child care leave for members of the state police twenty year retirement plan.
Title
Relates to authorizing service credit for unpaid or reduced paid child care leave for members of the state police twenty year retirement plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7914C |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1806 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7162C |
2022-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7162B |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7162A |
2022-03-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07914 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - tabled