NY S07160 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a television writers' and directors' fees and salaries credit; directs a study to be completed on the underutilization of minority and women screenwriters and directors.
Title
Relates to a television writers' and directors' fees and salaries credit; directs a study to be completed on the underutilization of minority and women screenwriters and directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-02-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.84 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09760 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken