NY S07160 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the receipt of electronic reports by the state central register of child abuse and maltreatment; requires the office of children and family services to develop and implement a web intake incident form for the receipt of electronic communications alleging child abuse or maltreatment.
Title
Authorizes the receipt of electronic reports by the state central register of child abuse and maltreatment; requires the office of children and family services to develop and implement a web intake incident form for the receipt of electronic communications alleging child abuse or maltreatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.505 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00160 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to children and families