NY S07154 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Gina Kehoe to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the town of Montgomery police department, notwithstanding the maximum age requirements for such examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Gina Kehoe to take the competitive civil service examination and be placed on the eligible civil service list for employment as a full-time police officer for the town of Montgomery police department, notwithstanding the maximum age requirements for such examination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-02AssemblySIGNED CHAP.388
2021-07-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-10Assemblyhome rule request
2021-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.735
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a7880a
2021-06-09Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-09SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2021-06-09SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1715
2021-06-03SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A07880 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7154

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback