NY S07152 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Redefines military service to include the United States Merchant Marine Academy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redefines military service to include the United States Merchant Marine Academy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-27AssemblySIGNED CHAP.300
2020-11-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-07-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-07-20Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.187
2020-07-20Assemblysubstituted for a9076
2020-03-10Assemblyreferred to education
2020-03-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-03-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-02-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.305
2020-01-09SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A09076 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.300

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback