NY S07146 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9736
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9736
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of the state of NY mortgage agency and extends the provisions of chapter 208 of the laws of 2010 amending the public authorities law relating to the powers of the state of New York mortgage agency.
Title
Relates to the powers of the state of NY mortgage agency and extends the provisions of chapter 208 of the laws of 2010 amending the public authorities law relating to the powers of the state of New York mortgage agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9736 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.780 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09736 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - signed chap.280