NY S07137 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes ambulatory surgery centers established exclusively to create and maintain vascular access necessary to dialyze patients with end stage renal disease as part of diagnostic or treatment centers to provide end stage renal disease services.
Title
Includes ambulatory surgery centers established exclusively to create and maintain vascular access necessary to dialyze patients with end stage renal disease as part of diagnostic or treatment centers to provide end stage renal disease services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.987 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1733 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08080 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to health