NY S07134 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for members of the security force employed by Kaleida Health.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for members of the security force employed by Kaleida Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.418 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.415 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9828a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED 7134A |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1095 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09828 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7134a