NY S07127 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - PRINT NUMBER 7127A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes twenty-five year retirement programs for members of the New York city employees' retirement system employed as fire protection inspectors and associate fire protection inspectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes twenty-five year retirement programs for members of the New York city employees' retirement system employed as fire protection inspectors and associate fire protection inspectors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-27SenatePRINT NUMBER 7127A
2024-03-27SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2023-05-18SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09822 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - referred to governmental employees

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback