NY S07120 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires parity in the mental and physical health treatment of the residents of New York state; provides that both mental and physical health "will be matters of public concern and provision therefor shall be made by the state and by such of its subdivisions".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires parity in the mental and physical health treatment of the residents of New York state; provides that both mental and physical health "will be matters of public concern and provision therefor shall be made by the state and by such of its subdivisions".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateTO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
2020-06-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 7120A
2020-06-26SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2020-03-13SenateOPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2020-02-14SenateTO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A10225 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - to attorney-general for opinion

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback