NY S07120 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10205A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10205A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the provision of services to out-of-state school districts by boards of cooperative educational services.
Title
Relates to the provision of services to out-of-state school districts by boards of cooperative educational services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10205A |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1476 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7120A |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10205 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - signed chap.396