NY S07093 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.833
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.833
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the rules of evidence to permit the admission of an opposing party's statement if made by an agent or employee made within the scope of that relationship and during the existence of that relationship.
Title
Amends the rules of evidence to permit the admission of an opposing party's statement if made by an agent or employee made within the scope of that relationship and during the existence of that relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.833 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.796 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a8040 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1732 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08040 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7093