NY S07082 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the time in which to file a claim relating to certain child sexual abuse cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the time in which to file a claim relating to certain child sexual abuse cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.130
2020-07-31SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-05-27Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-05-27Assemblypassed assembly
2020-05-27Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.25
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted for a9036
2020-05-27Assemblyreferred to codes
2020-05-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-05-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-05-27SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.639
2020-05-26SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A09036 (Same As) 2020-05-27 - substituted by s7082

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback