NY S07077 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.391
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to powers of attorney in relation to decedents' estates required to be in writing and recorded.
Title
Relates to powers of attorney in relation to decedents' estates required to be in writing and recorded.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.391 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.881 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a9759 |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-05 | Senate | AMENDED 7077A |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.426 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09759 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - substituted by s7077a