NY S07072 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Canton to reduce the speed limit on East Main Street to forty miles per hour.
Title
Authorizes the village of Canton to reduce the speed limit on East Main Street to forty miles per hour.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.975 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7072A |
2020-07-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10030 (Same As) 2020-07-14 - print number 10030a