NY S07068 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to the special powers of the New York state environmental facilities corporation to 2026.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to the special powers of the New York state environmental facilities corporation to 2026.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7383 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1412 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07383 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - signed chap.307