NY S07053 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.713
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.713
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the suspension of a license to drive a motor vehicle or motorcycle; provides that such license suspension can be lifted if the individual enters into an installment payment plan to pay fines.
Title
Relates to the suspension of a license to drive a motor vehicle or motorcycle; provides that such license suspension can be lifted if the individual enters into an installment payment plan to pay fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.713 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.734 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7874a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1708 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7053A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07874 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7053a