NY S07051 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the division of veterans' services to provide the division's copy of the veteran's DD-214 form to the appropriate county veterans' service agency upon the release of veterans from service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the division of veterans' services to provide the division's copy of the veteran's DD-214 form to the appropriate county veterans' service agency upon the release of veterans from service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-12SenateAMENDED (T) 7051A
2020-02-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.401
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A08002 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - print number 8002a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback