NY S07050 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.423
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until two years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Title
Relates to extending the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until two years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.423 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.255 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a10295 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1257 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A10295 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s7050