NY S07043 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents discrimination against persons with physical or mental disabilities in regards to organ donations.
Title
Prevents discrimination against persons with physical or mental disabilities in regards to organ donations.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.402 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09630 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - referred to mental health