NY S07037 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a transportation contract of the Cold Spring Harbor central school district.
Title
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a transportation contract of the Cold Spring Harbor central school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-27 | Senate | vetoed memo.61 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1009 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7037 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.81 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.81 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-12-30 | Senate | referred to education |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8896 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1009 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
S02977 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.130
A04944 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.130
A08896 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled
A04944 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.130
A08896 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled