NY S07034 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-14 - PRINT NUMBER 7034A
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-14 - PRINT NUMBER 7034A
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies who can operate a handicapping tournament; requires handicapping tournament operators to distribute no less than eighty percent of entry fees as prizes to the winners of a handicapping tournament.
Title
Specifies who can operate a handicapping tournament; requires handicapping tournament operators to distribute no less than eighty percent of entry fees as prizes to the winners of a handicapping tournament.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7034A |
2022-09-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A07840 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - print number 7840a