NY S07034 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Panama central school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Panama central school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.56 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1008 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7034 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.84 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.84 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-12-30 | Senate | referred to education |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8926 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1008 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05442 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - tabled
S06365 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - tabled
A08926 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - tabled
S06365 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - tabled
A08926 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - tabled