NY S07033 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7713
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to pleas of guilty and removal of adolescent offender proceedings to the family court.
Title
Relates to pleas of guilty and removal of adolescent offender proceedings to the family court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7713 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1587 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07713 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - approval memo.158