NY S07028 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2396A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2396A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires contracts for cable television and broadband internet attachments to utility poles and the use of utility ducts, trenches and conduits to include all such poles, ducts, trenches and conduits located within a given city, town or village pursuant to a negotiated site license; relates to necessary repairs and replacement costs.
Title
Requires contracts for cable television and broadband internet attachments to utility poles and the use of utility ducts, trenches and conduits to include all such poles, ducts, trenches and conduits located within a given city, town or village pursuant to a negotiated site license; relates to necessary repairs and replacement costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2396A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1586 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02396 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - approval memo.93